+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Borrelli flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
January 23, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1