+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Leach motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1158 on Third Reading on February 9, 2022. Motion carried.
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:24PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 15
January 12, 2022: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor