+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Engrossed Bill - Weninger - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Weninger motioned that pursuant to Rule 12 (O) Senate Bill 1156 be referred to an Additional Committee of the Whole for the purposes of amending. Motion passed v/v.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:45PM.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Mesnard motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1156 on Third Reading on March 11, 2021. Motion carried.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- COM (ref Bill) adopted
- Mesnard flr amend (ref COM) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 20, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
April 19, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 28
March 17, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
March 17, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 16, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 14, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor