+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- COM (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 14, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor