+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:41PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:35PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 14
February 20, 2017: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 20, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 9, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
January 19, 2017: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor