+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Failed to pass
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Robson
- Final disposition: Held in House
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pm
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Robson Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Robson Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
1-29ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2014: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 13, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor