+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRANSIT (ref Bill) adopted
- Worsley flr amend (ref TRANSIT) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 28
March 6, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 6, 2017: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 27, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 19, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 19, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7