+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 9, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor