+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: withdrawn.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:26PM.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 25, 2019: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 26, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 18, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 23, 2019: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor