+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 34
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - McCune Davis
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:00 pmobject
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: McComish flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-19 cem_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-28 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 26, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 25, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 18, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
January 24, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1