+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Appropriations: Held
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Higher Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Rules
- House first read
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Higher Education: Do pass
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2008: Higher Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 13, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 24, 2008: Higher Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor