+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 60
- Action: Signed
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Government: Do pass
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment adopted: Allen S flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref GOV)
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass amended
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Government Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen S. Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-15 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Allen S. Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
7-23 gov_aspassedsenate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 29, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
June 22, 2009: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
June 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 18, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
June 4, 2009: Government Institutions: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor