+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: failed to pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRANSIT (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2017: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 6
February 23, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
February 1, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor