+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Montenegro to exclude the Worsley flr amend (ref transit)
- Senator Montenegro to exclude the transit amendment as amended
- TRANSIT (ref Bill) adopted
- Worsley flr amend (ref TRANSIT) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Senator Montenegro to show the bill failed to pass
- Senator Montenegro to show the bill be retained
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 1, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor