+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 235 e
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Fann
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:47 pmobject
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: NRRA (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (12)
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Fann Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Fann Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-11 cem_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
2-20 nrra-approp_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
June 13, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 11, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2013: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor