+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 189
- Action: Signed
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:51 pm
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:56 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
1-20 jud_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
1-20jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
February 20, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 18, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7