+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: FAILED
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by TRANS - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
March 18, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
February 24, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 24, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
February 4, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 13, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor