+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill)
- Petersen flr amend (ref Bill) (sub FIN) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
January 16, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor