+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Farley flr amend (ref FIN) (sub RULES) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2017: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 27, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
January 23, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor