+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
January 19, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
January 19, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor