+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 64
- Action: Signed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment withdrawn: Floor Amend to Bill - Seel
- Amendment passed: AW
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- House first read
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Agriculture and Water
House Proposed Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Adopted Amendment
1-28 nrra
Senate Fact Sheet
Agriculture and Water
House Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 3, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 20, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2013: Agriculture and Water: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 6, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 24, 2013: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor