+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Final disposition: Held in House
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Paton flr amend (ref Bill)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
1142approp_as passed by the senate
Senate Fact Sheet
Paton Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Paton Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor