+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Townsend - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Townsend - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 4, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
May 4, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
April 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
April 25, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
March 1, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
February 24, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 19, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor