+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
June 4, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor