+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Dial flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Dial flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
May 6, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 20
May 6, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 6
March 8, 2016: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
March 3, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
January 19, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 19, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
January 19, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 19, 2016: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor