+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pm
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-14 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 22, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1