+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 39
- Action: Signed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 17, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2015: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 26, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor