+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Bundgaard flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Sinema flr amend (ref Bill)
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Bundgaard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Bundgaard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-24 bsfss_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Vote
January 18, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor