+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 132 e
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Harper
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:10 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Energy and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:45 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1-27 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 15, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2011: Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 15, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 18, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor