+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:41PM.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 15, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
February 20, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
January 24, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
January 24, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
January 24, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor