+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 131
- Action: Signed
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:10 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: NRT (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-25 nrt_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-20 nrt
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
February 15, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2011: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 8, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 18, 2011: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor