+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 183
- Action: Signed
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- Vote detail 50 8 2 0 passed
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Representative stevens moved that the House reconsider sb 1132 on thursday, april 17th, 2014. motion passed by v/v
- Motion
- 0 0 0 0
- Third read: Failed
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-30cem_aspassedcommittee
Senate Fact Sheet
1-27 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2014: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 36
February 25, 2014: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
February 20, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1