+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 138 e
- Action: Signed
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:56 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
3-22 jud_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
5-10 ce_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
1-23 ce
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
March 26, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
March 22, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 14, 2012: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 14, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 18, 2012: Commerce and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor