+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:24PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:04PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 19
February 20, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 20, 2017: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 2, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor