+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Boyer - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:41PM.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill) withdrawn
- Allen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 21, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
March 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 10
February 22, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 11
February 22, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 16, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor