+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:04PM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
February 27, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 18, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor