+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 15 e
- Action: Signed
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 1:39 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Allen flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:56 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Allen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-20 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
February 14, 2012: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 17, 2012: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6