+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 5 e
- Action: Signed
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: VMGA (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-27 vmga_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-20vmga
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 2
February 13, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 13, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 17, 2012: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (85)
Type:
Primary Sponsor