+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Final disposition: Held awaiting concurrence or conference
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Montenegro
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Carter
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Boyer
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill Montenegro passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill Boyer passed
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 12, 2015: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 10, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2015: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1