+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
January 14, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
January 14, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor