+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Held
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Rules
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Ward flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 10:13 amobject
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Ward flr amend (ref Bill) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor