+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 176
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Antenori
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Cheuvront flr amend (ref Bill)
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Antenori floor amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Antenori floor amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
1123jud_as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
1123jud_house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
1123JUD.DOC
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
July 1, 2009: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 5
June 16, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
June 16, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 4, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1