+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Held
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Finance
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2015: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
February 16, 2015: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor