+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
6-8 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
June 4, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1