+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 182
- Action: Signed
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: HHS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- House first read
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: HMLR (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
4-12 hmlr_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
2-8 health_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
1-18 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
April 12, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 15, 2011: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 18, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor