+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2021: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 24, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 12, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor