+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 147
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 10:13 am
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2015: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
February 24, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor