+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 3 e
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Sinema flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:45 pmobject
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 3, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
January 26, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
January 13, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor