+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 269
- Action: Signed
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Ward flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ward flr amend (ref JUD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor