+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Final disposition: Held awaiting concurrence or conference
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole:
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: TRANS
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to TRANS - Fann
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Withdrawn
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pm
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Ugenti SIT COW Floor Amendment; Reference to House engrossed Senate bill
House Adopted Amendment
Fann SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the TRANSPORTATION Committee amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Ugenti SIT COW Floor Amendment; Reference to House engrossed Senate bill
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Fann SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the TRANSPORTATION Committee amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 13, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 28, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2013: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 27, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2013: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor